HI SB1526 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1526
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 3:00PM in conference room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 3:00PM in conference room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for one DLNRTip app administrator position, software upgrades, and app enhancements to improve the DLNRTip app. (SB1526 HD1)
Title
Relating To Conservation Enforcement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 3:00PM in conference room 312. |
2019-04-24 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 959). |
2019-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-19 3:00PM in conference room 312. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Kahele Chair; Riviere Co-Chair; Wakai, Fevella. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 813). |
2019-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Todd Co-Chairs; Thielen. |
2019-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 799). |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2159), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Nishimoto. |
2019-04-01 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:30PM in conference room 308. |
2019-03-29 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-03-19. |
2019-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-29-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Gates, Har, Hashem, Lowen, McKelvey, Tokioka, Yamane excused (8). |
2019-03-18 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1390) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-13 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-13-19 9:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 515) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1008) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 267) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1526 (Carry Over) 2019-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 3:00PM in conference room 312.