HI SB1525 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Act 158, 06/27/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1260).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Act 158, 06/27/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1260).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent the licensure requirements for home care agencies licensed by the Department of Health. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Home Care Agencies.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] |
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Senate | Act 158, 06/27/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1260). |
2019-07-03 | House | Act 158, on 06/27/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1260). |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-26 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 965). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-04-26 | House | Deferred one day 04-30-19. |
2019-04-24 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-26-19. |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 8) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-24 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-19. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 8). |
2019-04-17 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Takumi, C. Lee, Say; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-19 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Takumi, C. Lee Co-Chairs; Say, Ward. |
2019-04-12 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 899). |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2019-04-05 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-05-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-04-19. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-03-19. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 524). |
2019-04-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Saiki, Todd excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1924), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-27 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McKelvey. |
2019-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-25 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-27-19 2:00PM. |
2019-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-25-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-22 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1583), recommending referral to JUD. |
2019-03-20 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Belatti, Har, Mizuno. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-20-19 2:15PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4). |
2019-03-15 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1326) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-03-12 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-12-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 514) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from CPH/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 888) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-27-19 9:40AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to CPH/JDC. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |