HI SB1524 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB1524

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to AEN/WTL/PSM, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the department of agriculture to use consistent units of measurement in its summary to the public on the amounts of restricted use pesticides used. Effective 1/1/2024, establishes a one-half mile buffer zone for pesticides around schools and state and county public parks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Pesticides.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-30SenateReferred to AEN/WTL/PSM, JDC/WAM.
2023-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-01-25SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB1524 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to AEN/WTL/PSM, JDC/WAM.
HB254 (Same As) 2023-01-25 - Referred to AGR, CPC, referral sheet 1

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback