HI SB1523 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1523
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - The committee on LCA deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - The committee on LCA deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that workers registered with the department of health's medical cannabis program be reimbursed for the out of pocket cost of medical cannabis through the workers' compensation system in certain circumstances.
Title
Relating To Workers' Compensation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee on LCA deferred the measure. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to LCA/CPH, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1523 (Carry Over) 2019-02-06 - The committee on LCA deferred the measure.
HB1534 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB1534 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1523&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1523_.HTM |