HI SB1523 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers jurisdiction of Waiahole-Waikane valley and leases therein from the Hawaii housing finance and development corporation to the Hawaii community development authority. Designates lands in Waiahole valley as important agricultural lands.
Title
Waiahole-Waikane Valley
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in WLH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Shimabukuro. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Referred to WLH, WAM. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1523 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB1523_.HTM |