HI SB152 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB152

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends requirements for the restraint of child passengers. Requires rear facing child safety seats for children under two years of age. Repeals exceptions for compliance. Raises certain fines for violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Child Passenger Restraints.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-19SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
2021-02-19SenateReported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 540) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
2021-02-18SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-01-22SenateReferred to TRS, JDC.
2021-01-21SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-21SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB152 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback