HI SB152 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB152
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Re-referred to CPC, referral sheet 31
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Re-referred to CPC, referral sheet 31
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Corrects labeling dimension with regard to fireworks used for display.
Title
Relating To Fireworks Labeling.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | House | Re-referred to CPC, referral sheet 31 |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 57). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 908) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee on CPH has rescheduled its decision making to 02-26-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPH. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 565) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPH. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to PSM, CPH. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB152 (Carry Over) 2019-03-12 - Re-referred to CPC, referral sheet 31
HB499 (Same As) 2019-07-05 - Act 185, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1287).
HB499 (Same As) 2019-07-05 - Act 185, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1287).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=152&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB152_.HTM |