HI SB1519 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1519
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires organizations supporting public schools to obtain a written revocable permit from the chancellor of the University of Hawaii or principal to use the school's name in association with the school support organization.
Title
Relating To Organizations Supporting Public Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to HRE/EDU, JDC. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1519 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to HRE/EDU, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1519&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB1519_.HTM |