HI SB1517 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-15 - (S) The committee on PGM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-15 - (S) The committee on PGM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs DPS to prepare preliminary design and request for proposals for the design, development, and operation of a correctional treatment facility and to consider the undeveloped portion on the existing Halawa correctional facility as a possible site for the facility. Appropriates funds.
Title
Correctional Facilities Development Study; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-15 | (S) The committee on PGM deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-11 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Referred to PGM, WAM. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1517 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SB1517_.HTM |