HI SB1508 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1508
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires developers of housing projects that are exempt from certain laws to enter into profit-sharing agreements with the tenants of those properties.
Title
Relating To Rent To Build Equity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee on HOU deferred the measure. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 1:20PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1508 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1508&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1508_.HTM |