HI SB1502 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1502

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Adds the chairperson of the Hawaiian Homes Commission or the chairperson's designee to serve as an ex officio, voting member of the Commission on Water Resource Management.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Chairperson Of The Hawaiian Homes Commission.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to WLH, JUD, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 505).
2019-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01SenateDeferred until 03-05-19.
2019-02-28SenateOne Day Notice 03-01-19.
2019-02-28SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading.
2019-02-28SenateReported from HWN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 684) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, Ihara, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on HWN/WTL has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-07-19 1:16PM in conference room 016.
2019-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on HWN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 1:15PM in conference room 016.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to HWN/WTL.
2019-01-28SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB1502 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to WLH, JUD, referral sheet 27

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback