HI SB1500 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Department of Health to collaborate with various agencies to research and develop a plan for a mechanism for increased water circulation in Pokai Bay. Requires the Department of Health to report its activities to the legislature. Takes effect 12/31/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Water Circulation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseReferred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 503) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01SenateOne Day Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1084) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Taniguchi.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-13SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-13SenateReported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 266) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to WTL, WAM.
2019-01-28SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1439 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 6

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback