HI SB150 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Specifies that an affidavit on application for voter registration shall be a part of the application associated with the issuance of a civil identification card and driver's license. Requires each county examiner of drivers to electronically store the contents of the affidavit on application for voter registration provided by applicants in conjunction with their driver's license and civil identification card applications and provide electronic accessibility of this information. Effective 01/07/2059. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter Registration; Driver's License; Civil Identification Card

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-12HouseReferred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30
2015-03-12HousePass First Reading
2015-03-10HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 72) in amended form (SD 2).
2015-03-10SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
2015-03-06Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15.
2015-03-06SenateReported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 702) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2015-02-27SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
2015-02-27SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2015-02-24SenateThe committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-15 10:05AM in conference room 211.
2015-02-03SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.
2015-02-03SenateReported from TRA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 5) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL/WAM.
2015-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on TRA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRA were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Harimoto, English, Espero, Inouye, Kidani, Kouchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
2015-01-29SenateRe-Referred to TRA, JDL/WAM.
2015-01-27SenateThe committee(s) on TRA deferred the measure until 01-29-15 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2015-01-23SenateThe committee(s) on TRA has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-15 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2015-01-22SenateReferred to TRA, JDL.
2015-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2015-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback