HI SB15 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to CPH/JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to CPH/JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the application of mandatory mortgage foreclosure dispute resolution by requiring mortgagees, at the mortgagor's election, to participate in mediation to avoid foreclosure or mitigate damages from foreclosure prior to filing a judicial foreclosure action for property that has been the mortgagor's primary residence for a specified period. Applies the dispute resolution requirement to judicial foreclosure actions filed prior to the effective date of this measure and pending an initial court hearing. Appropriates funds. Effective December 1, 2015; appropriations effective July 1, 2015.
Title
Mortgage Foreclosures; Judicial Foreclosure; Mandatory Dispute Resolution; Mediation; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] |
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH/JDL, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to CPN/JDL, WAM. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB132 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=15&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB15_.HTM |