HI SB1496 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1496
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Hawaii community development authority to permit one building of up to seven hundred sixty-eight feet in height within each approved master plan area for the Mauka area of the Kakaako community development district; provided that the building be located near a transit station and appropriate and proportional public benefits are negotiated for any increase in a building above four hundred eighteen feet.
Title
Relating To The Kakaako Community Development District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee on HOU deferred the measure. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HOU/WTL, WAM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1496 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1496&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1496_.HTM |