HI SB1486 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 230, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1332).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows the DPS Narcotics Enforcement Division Administrator to disclose confidential information from the Electronic Prescription Accountability System to the U.S. Department of Defense health agency prescription monitoring program and authorized employees of the State DOH Alcohol and Drug Abuse Division and the Emergency Medical Services and Injury Prevention Systems Branch. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Electronic Prescription Accountability System.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateAct 230, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1332).
2019-07-09HouseAct 230, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1332).
2019-05-06SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 61) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 61).
2019-04-25HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, C. Lee, Belatti, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-25SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-04-24SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-19 3:35PM in conference room 016.
2019-04-17HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 907).
2019-04-17SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Baker Co-Chair; Harimoto, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, C. Lee Co-Chairs; Belatti, Tokioka, Ward.
2019-04-05HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685).
2019-04-05SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-04SenateDeferred One Day 04-05-19.
2019-04-03SenateDeferred One Day 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 534).
2019-04-02HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Saiki, Todd, Yamane excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-02HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1927), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-27HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McKelvey.
2019-03-25HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-25HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-27-19 2:00PM.
2019-03-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-25-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-21HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).
2019-03-21HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1522) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-03-19HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, San Buenaventura.
2019-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-19-19 10:00AM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 498) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01SenateOne Day Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 910) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
2019-02-22SenateThe committee on CPH has rescheduled its decision making to 02-26-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH.
2019-02-15SenateReported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 441) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH.
2019-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Harimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to PSM, CPH.
2019-01-28SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1313 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 6

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback