HI SB1484 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1484
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the department of land and natural resources to devise an appropriate plan to create a hiking trail from Malaekahana state park, along the coast, to Turtle Bay Resort passing makai of the James Campbell National Wildlife Refuge and continuing from Kawela Bay along the coast of Waialee to Sunset Beach. Takes effect 12/31/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Hiking Trails.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 517) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-13-19 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1484 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Hiking Trails
Kawela Bay to Sunset Beach
Malaekahana State Park to Turtle Bay
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Hiking Trails
Kawela Bay to Sunset Beach
Malaekahana State Park to Turtle Bay