HI SB1482 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1482
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii commercial harbors authority. Transfers jurisdiction and functions relating to commercial harbors and commercial maritime operations from the department of transportation to the Hawaii commercial harbors authority. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Commercial Harbors Authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee on TRS deferred the measure. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 3:30PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRS/GVO, WAM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to TRS, WAM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1482 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Commercial Harbors
Commercial Maritime Facilities, Operations, and Activities
Department of Transportation
Hawaii Commercial Harbors Authority
Commercial Harbors
Commercial Maritime Facilities, Operations, and Activities
Department of Transportation
Hawaii Commercial Harbors Authority
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1482&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1482_.HTM |