HI SB1481 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-18 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-18 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the offense of obstructing access to public property to include the installment of certain visual impediments. Creates a private right of action for a person to enforce the prohibition of obstruction. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Obstruction of Public Access; Cause of Action
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Pohai Ryan [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-18 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-03-15 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO on Friday, 03-18-11 8:30AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to WLO, JUD, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 347) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 566) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara. | |
2011-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-23-11 9:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-11 10:15AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |