HI SB1467 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Restricts asset forfeiture to cases involving the commission of a covered criminal misdemeanor or felony offense. Requires seized property to be forfeited only when the property owner has been convicted of an underlying covered criminal misdemeanor or felony offense. Changes the standard of proof that the State must meet in order for property to be forfeited from "preponderance of the evidence" to "beyond a reasonable doubt". Requires the State to prove that owners consented to or possessed knowledge of the crime that led to the seizure of their property. Requires that the agency seizing the property pay for safe and secure storage of the seized property until the completion of the forfeiture proceeding or final disposition of the property. Directs any proceeds from a civil forfeiture to the general revenue fund for public education purposes. Repeals administrative forfeiture proceedings. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Property Forfeiture.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-12SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 217) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to JDC, WAM.
2019-01-28SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback