HI SB1466 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Act 150, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1252).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a process by which a law enforcement officer, family or household member, medical professional, educator, or colleague may obtain a court order to prevent a person from accessing firearms and ammunition when the person poses a danger of causing bodily injury to oneself or another. (SB1466 HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Gun Violence Protective Orders.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01SenateAct 150, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1252).
2019-07-01HouseAct 150, on 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1252).
2019-04-18SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 916).
2019-04-18SenatePassed Final Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani . 2 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella, Gabbard. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-17SenateOne Day Notice 04-18-19.
2019-04-17SenateSenate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-18-19.
2019-04-17SenateReconsideration of action taken on 04-11-19 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Takayama, C. Lee Co-Chairs; Thielen.
2019-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
2019-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 797).
2019-04-09HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Quinlan, Say, Tokioka, Ward voting no (11) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-05HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19.
2019-04-05HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2207) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-27HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, Morikawa, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McKelvey.
2019-03-25HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-25HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-27-19 2:00PM.
2019-03-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-25-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-20HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Cachola, DeCoite, Matsumoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Kong, McDermott, Okimoto, Quinlan, Ward voting no (6) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-20HouseReported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1503) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-03-15HouseThe committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, Nishimoto, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, McDermott; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kong; and Excused: none.
2019-03-13HouseBill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Friday, 03-15-19 10:00AM in House conference room 430.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to PVM, JUD, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 495) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani, Riviere. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Fevella, Gabbard). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-02-28SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 802) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Wakai, Gabbard, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-22-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2019-02-15SenateReported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 483) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2019-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Harimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to PSM, JDC.
2019-01-28SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback