HI SB1466 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Act 150, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1252).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Act 150, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1252).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a process by which a law enforcement officer, family or household member, medical professional, educator, or colleague may obtain a court order to prevent a person from accessing firearms and ammunition when the person poses a danger of causing bodily injury to oneself or another. (SB1466 HD2)
Title
Relating To Gun Violence Protective Orders.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Senate | Act 150, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1252). |
2019-07-01 | House | Act 150, on 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1252). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 916). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani . 2 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella, Gabbard. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-18-19. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-18-19. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-19 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takayama, C. Lee Co-Chairs; Thielen. |
2019-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 797). |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Quinlan, Say, Tokioka, Ward voting no (11) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2207) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-27 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, Morikawa, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McKelvey. |
2019-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-25 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-27-19 2:00PM. |
2019-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-25-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Cachola, DeCoite, Matsumoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Kong, McDermott, Okimoto, Quinlan, Ward voting no (6) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1503) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-03-15 | House | The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, Nishimoto, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, McDermott; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kong; and Excused: none. |
2019-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Friday, 03-15-19 10:00AM in House conference room 430. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to PVM, JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 495) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani, Riviere. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Fevella, Gabbard). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 802) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Wakai, Gabbard, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-22-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 483) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Harimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |