HI SB146 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB146
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows procuring agencies to use a list of qualified persons for a particular professional service for up to three years. Allows purchasing agencies to waive any requirement for professional service providers who are on a prepared list of qualified persons to submit an updated list of qualifications and expressions of interest for at least three years from the date that the prepared list was created.
Title
Relating To The Procurement Of Professional Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB146 (Carry Over) 2023-01-20 - Referred to GVO, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=146&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB146_.HTM |