HI SB1451 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizes La Kuokoa, Hawaiian Recognition Day, as an official state holiday. (SB1451 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To State Holidays.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-22HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1568), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-20HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Yamane.
2019-03-19HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-20-19 2:10PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-19HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-19.
2019-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1).
2019-03-14HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1293) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-03-12HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Quinlan.
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-12-19 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 487) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1039) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella.
2019-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-26-19 11:30AM in conference room 016.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-02-11SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
2019-02-11SenateReported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 155) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
2019-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, Ihara, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on HWN added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-05-19 1:15PM in conference room 016.
2019-01-31SenateRe-Referred to HWN, JDC.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to HWN/LCA, JDC.
2019-01-28SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1119 (Same As) 2019-02-01 - Re-referred to TIA, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 10

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback