HI SB1442 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 239, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1341).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 239, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1341).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Public Utilities Commission to consider the value of improving electric power systems data access and transparency in order to make informed decisions. Establishes guiding principles. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Public Utilities Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | Act 239, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1341). |
2019-07-09 | House | Act 239, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1341). |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 167) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 167). |
2019-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Takumi, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 826). |
2019-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 951). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Wakai Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2019-04-22 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Takumi, Wildberger Co-Chairs; Thielen. |
2019-04-05 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-05-19. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 568). |
2019-04-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1969), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt. |
2019-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-22 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1585), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-19 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). |
2019-03-14 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1298) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-03-12 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-12-19 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 486) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from CPH/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 791) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, J.Keohokalole, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to CPH/EET. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |