HI SB1435 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1435
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriate funds to the Department of Health for the purchase of one advanced life support ambulance and related equipment to be based in Central Maui, and to fund pay-related personnel costs for state-certified emergency medical services personnel.
Title
Relating To Ambulances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to HHS, WAM. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1245 (Same As) 2024-03-20 - Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 340).
SB1435 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to HHS, WAM.
SB1435 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to HHS, WAM.
Subjects
Advanced Life Support Ambulance
Appropriation ($)
Central Maui
Department of Health
Emergency Medical Services
Appropriation ($)
Central Maui
Department of Health
Emergency Medical Services
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1435&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB1435_.HTM |