HI SB1431 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1431

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 45
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes an income tax credit for commercial seawater air conditioning systems connecting to a seawater air conditioning district cooling system. Requires the Hawaii state energy office to certify tax credits. Applies to eligible seawater air conditioning systems that are placed into service on or after 12/31/2020. Makes tax credit inapplicable for taxable years after 12/31/2030. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Renewable Energy Technologies Tax Credits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16HouseRe-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 45
2020-03-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3).
2020-03-13HouseReported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1055-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LMG.
2020-03-12HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane, Thielen.
2020-03-09HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-12-20 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
2020-03-09HouseReferred to EEP, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 36
2020-03-05HousePass First Reading
2020-03-03HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 82) in amended form (SD 2).
2020-03-03SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Kim, Riviere, L. Thielen. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2020-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20.
2020-02-28SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3289) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2020-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele.
2020-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-20 12:40PM in conference room 211.
2020-02-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2020-02-14SenateReported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2713) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2020-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Inouye, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Fevella.
2020-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on EET deferred the measure until 02-07-20 2:45PM in conference room 414.
2020-01-27SenateThe committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-20 2:55PM in conference room 414.
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to EET, WAM.
2019-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1302 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB1431 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to EET, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback