HI SB1425 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a seller to include certain disclosures when advertising or marketing for sale carcasses, sides, or primal cuts of meat for consumption. Prohibits certain labeling, marketing practices, and misrepresentations of products or grades.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Agriculture.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-06SenateThe committee on AEN deferred the measure.
2019-02-06SenateThe committee on CPH deferred the measure.
2019-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on CPH/AEN added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-06-19 1:15PM in conference room 224.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to CPH/AEN, JDC.
2019-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback