HI SB1424 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1424
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii Correctional System Oversight Commission and transfers all rights, powers, functions, and duties of the Reentry Commission and Corrections Population Management Commission to the Hawaii Correctional System Oversight Commission. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Public Safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from PSM/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 350) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to PSM/GVO, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1424 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
HB1552 (Same As) 2019-07-05 - Act 179, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1281).
HB1552 (Same As) 2019-07-05 - Act 179, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1281).