HI SB1419 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1419
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the University of Hawaii to include as part of its capital improvement projects budget request, all long-term leases it enters into with the intent to purchase. (SB1419 HD2)
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1579) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-20 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, McKelvey, Yamane. |
2019-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-20-19 2:10PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-19 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-19. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4). |
2019-03-15 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1315) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-03-12 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Tuesday, 03-12-19 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to LHE, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 480) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 998) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 280) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 2:50PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HRE, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1419 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).