HI SB1414 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1414
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Higher Education & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Higher Education & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain University of Hawaii contracts involving research and training from the Hawaii Public Procurement Code and requires the Board of Regents to develop internal policies and procedures for those procurements. Repeals the requirement that the Board of Regents develop internal policies and procedures for the procurement of construction. Authorizes the University of Hawaii President to delegate procurement authority for research and training to the University's Vice President for Research and Innovation. Requires the Board of Regents to submit reports to the Legislature. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to HET, LGO, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 440) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 757) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 283) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fukunaga, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Re-Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to HRE/GVO, WAM. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1414 (Carry Over) 2023-03-09 - Referred to HET, LGO, FIN, referral sheet 17