HI SB1414 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB1414

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Referred to HET, LGO, FIN, referral sheet 17
Pending: House Higher Education & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts certain University of Hawaii contracts involving research and training from the Hawaii Public Procurement Code and requires the Board of Regents to develop internal policies and procedures for those procurements. Repeals the requirement that the Board of Regents develop internal policies and procedures for the procurement of construction. Authorizes the University of Hawaii President to delegate procurement authority for research and training to the University's Vice President for Research and Innovation. Requires the Board of Regents to submit reports to the Legislature. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The University Of Hawaii.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-09HouseReferred to HET, LGO, FIN, referral sheet 17
2023-03-09HousePass First Reading
2023-03-07HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 440) in amended form (SD 2).
2023-03-07SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
2023-03-03Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
2023-03-03SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 757) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2023-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2023-02-16SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
2023-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2023-02-15SenateReported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 283) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2023-02-09SenateThe committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fukunaga, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2023-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
2023-02-02SenateRe-Referred to HRE, WAM.
2023-01-30SenateReferred to HRE/GVO, WAM.
2023-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-01-25SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB1414 (Carry Over) 2023-03-09 - Referred to HET, LGO, FIN, referral sheet 17

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback