HI SB1412 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Act 120, on 06/28/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1222).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Act 120, on 06/28/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1222).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds to assist HK Management LLC, in planning, designing, constructing, reconstructing, renovating, acquiring, equipping, and improving surf industry center facilities. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Special Purpose Revenue Bonds For The Honokea Surf Village.
Sponsors
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-29 | House | Act 120, on 06/28/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1222). |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Act 120, 06/28/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1222). |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634). |
2021-04-28 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858). |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 2 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella. 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti excused (1). |
2021-04-22 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-27-21. |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 21) as amended in (CD 1). |
2021-04-22 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 21). |
2021-04-20 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-20-21 1:45PM; CR 325. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559). |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-21 1:30PM; CR 325. |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Quinlan, Holt Co-Chairs; Okimoto. |
2021-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 792). |
2021-04-15 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 790). |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Shimabukuro Chair; Kanuha Co-Chair; Wakai, Fevella. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 552). |
2021-04-13 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Ohno excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-04-09 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1862) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Perruso. |
2021-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-01-21 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matsumoto, Mizuno excused (2). |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 963) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-03-05 | House | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-03-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 03-05-21 10:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2021-02-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-02-22 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 52) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Acasio). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-22-21. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 573) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-17-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 196) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to HWN, WAM. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |