HI SB1408 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB1408

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to TCA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates a mileage-based road usage charge to replace state motor fuel taxes beginning on July 1, 2025, for electric vehicles. Eliminates $50 annual state vehicle registration surcharge for electric vehicles. Allows electric vehicles a choice of paying a registration surcharge or a per-mile road usage charge until 2033. Requires motor vehicle registration application to specify whether the type of fuel for which the vehicle is adapted is electricity. Requires certificates of inspection to state the odometer reading of vehicles. Requires the Department of Transportation to plan for the deployment of a state mileage-based road user charge program by 2033 and submit a report to the Legislature no later than twenty days prior to the convening of the Regular Session of 2026. Defines electric vehicle. Defines alternative fuel vehicle. Makes an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Road Usage Charge Program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-30SenateReferred to TCA, WAM.
2023-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-01-25SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB1408 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to TCA, WAM.
HB1110 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to TCA, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback