HI SB1406 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1406
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii unemployment insurance advisory board, independent of the department of land and industrial relations that is housed under the department of the attorney general.
Title
Relating To Unemployment Insurance.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Re-Referred to LCA, JDC/WAM. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to LCA, JDC. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1406 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Re-Referred to LCA, JDC/WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1406&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB1406_.HTM |