HI SB1405 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1405
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates general revenues to expand state-run quarantine facilities under the jurisdiction of the department of agriculture's plant quarantine branch. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Plant Quarantine Branch.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 468) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-21 1:00PM in conference room Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1405 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.