HI SB1401 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1401
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of transportation to report on the complete streets policy and principles. Requires the department of transportation to establish standards relating to safe travel along state roadways and a complete streets checklist. Requires the director of transportation to provide training for maintenance staff in complete street policies, principles, and implementation procedures. Requires counties to consider complete street policies when adopting or amending land use ordinances. Effective 5/6/2137. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Transportation.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] |
Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-23-21 at 2:30PM in Conference Room CR 329. |
2021-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-23-21 10:00AM in conference room CR 329. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-21 10:00AM; CR 329. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-21 10:00AM; CR 329. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559). |
2021-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 808). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, Matayoshi, Ilagan Co-Chairs; Tokioka, Matsumoto. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Lee Chair; Rhoads, Moriwaki Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2021-04-13 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 439). |
2021-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1689), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-31 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2021-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-31-21 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1460) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-03-23 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi. |
2021-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). |
2021-03-19 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1035) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-03-17 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura, Matsumoto. |
2021-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-17-21 10:30AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to TRN, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 423) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 713) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-21 10:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 224) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 3:05PM in conference room 224. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRS, JDC/WAM. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to TRS, JDC. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1401 (Carry Over) 2021-04-23 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-23-21 at 2:30PM in Conference Room CR 329.
Subjects
Complete Streets Law
Complete Streets Policy
Counties
Department of Transportation
Training
Transportation
Complete Streets Policy
Counties
Department of Transportation
Training
Transportation