HI SB1397 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1397
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages Hawaii corporations to make a commitment to social responsibility. Establishes a social responsibility corporate awards program within the department of business, economic development, and tourism to recognize corporations that have performed sustainable corporate practices. Requires the legislative reference bureau to conduct a study regarding socially responsible corporations in the State.
Title
Relating To Corporate Social Responsibility.
Sponsors
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to EET/CPN, JDC. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1397 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to EET/CPN, JDC.
Subjects
Awards Program
Corporate Practices
Corporations
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Legislative Reference Bureau
Social Responsibility
Sustainable Practices
Corporate Practices
Corporations
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Legislative Reference Bureau
Social Responsibility
Sustainable Practices
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1397&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB1397_.HTM |