HI SB1395 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1395
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Updates the Uniform Controlled Substances Act, chapter 329, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to make it consistent with amendments in the federal controlled substances law as required by section 329-11, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Title
Relating To The Uniform Controlled Substances Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1395 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to JDC.
HB1097 (Same As) 2023-06-30 - Act 162, 06/29/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1265).
HB1097 (Same As) 2023-06-30 - Act 162, 06/29/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1265).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1395&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/SB1395_.HTM |