HI SB1388 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1388
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the required period for a notice of summary possession from five business days to fifteen calendar days. Requires landlords to provide notice with specified terms to a tenant and enter into mediation with the tenant. Delays when a landlord may seek possession of a dwelling unit if the tenant schedules or attempts to schedule mediation. Requires landlords to provide the notice to mediation centers that offer free mediation for residential landlord-tenant disputes. Restricts when a landlord may exercise these remedies depending on the number of days that have elapsed following the expiration date of the governor's final eviction moratorium and the amount of rent due. Appropriates funds for the judiciary to contract for mediation services. Repeals 12/31/2022, or one year after expiration of the governor's final eviction moratorium emergency supplementary proclamation related to the coronavirus disease 2019 pandemic, whichever is sooner. Effective 5/6/2137. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Landlord-tenant Code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). |
2021-03-19 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1104) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-03-18 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, DeCoite, Ilagan, Kitagawa, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi. |
2021-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 03-18-21 9:15AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to HSG, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 420) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 720) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-21 9:45AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 384) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-12-21 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videconference. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDC. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1388 (Carry Over) 2021-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
HB1376 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Act 057, 06/16/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1157).
HB1376 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Act 057, 06/16/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1157).