HI SB1381 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB1381

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a special intergovernmental task force to eradicate illegal gambling and drug activities and to establish community safe zones across the State. Requires a report to the legislature. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Crime.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-19SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
2021-02-19SenateReported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 414) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
2021-02-16SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, English, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 1:20PM; Via Videoconference.
2021-02-08SenateRe-Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM.
2021-02-01SenateReferred to PSM, JDC.
2021-01-29SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1249 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1381 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback