HI SB1381 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-10 - (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 33
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-10 - (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 33
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends by one year the deadline for the Hawaii health authority to submit to the legislature a comprehensive health plan for all individuals in the State.
Title
Hawaii Health Authority; Comprehensive Health Plan
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 330). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Deferred until 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) One Day Notice 03-04-11. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 516) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-16 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Baker, Chun Oakland, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-16-11 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Referred to HTH. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1381 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SB1381_.HTM |