HI SB1376 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1376
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds as a grant to the Hawaii labor heritage council for a documentary film on the life of Ah Quon McElrath.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Labor Heritage Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 533) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Re-Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to LCA/EET, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1376 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Ah Quon McElrath
Appropriation ($)
Department of Labor and Industrial Relations
Documentary Film
Hawaii Labor Heritage Council
Appropriation ($)
Department of Labor and Industrial Relations
Documentary Film
Hawaii Labor Heritage Council