HI SB1372 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB1372

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates a cultivation facility license, which allows cultivators to grow cannabis for sale to licensed dispensaries. Establishes requirements for license application and qualifications for license holders. Establishes requirements for cultivation facility operations, including plant tracking and testing. Clarifies that cultivation facilities may sell product only to licensed dispensaries. Authorizes the Department of Health to determine the number of cultivation licenses to be issued. Allows one cultivation license to be issued per tax map key number. Limits the number of cannabis plants grown at each cultivation facility to one thousand. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Medical Cannabis.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-19SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
2021-02-19SenateReported from HTH/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 502) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC.
2021-02-16SenateThe committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Misalucha ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-16SenateThe committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 9:00AM; 229 & Videoconference.
2021-02-05SenateRe-Referred to HTH/CPN, WAM/JDC.
2021-02-05SenateRe-Referred to CPN, WAM/JDC.
2021-02-01SenateReferred to CPN, JDC.
2021-01-29SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB1372 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback