HI SB1371 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1371
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes government agencies to wheel electricity that is produced by their own facilities from renewable energy sources to another agency's facilities, subject to disallowance by the public utilities commission. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Energy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from GVO/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 555) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Lee, Riviere. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-21 3:20PM; 224 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to GVO/EET, CPN. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1371 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
HB1290 (Same As) 2021-02-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Har, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
HB1290 (Same As) 2021-02-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Har, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).