HI SB1369 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1369
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
By 12/31/2027, requires the transfer of the Oahu Regional Health Care System in its entirety from the Hawaii Health Systems Corporation to the Department of Health. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Repeal Of Act 212, Session Laws Of Hawaii 2021, As Amended By Act 150, Session Laws Of Hawaii 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 572) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to HHS, JDC/WAM. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to HHS, JDC. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1071 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB1369 (Carry Over) 2023-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
SB1369 (Carry Over) 2023-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.