HI SB1366 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB1366

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires state and county officials, officers, and employees, whenever answering a telephone call, video call, or other form of interactive telecommunication in the performance of their official duties, to identify themselves by first name and offer a polite salutation, consistent with the aloha spirit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Government Employees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-01SenateReferred to LCA, JDC.
2021-01-29SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1204 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1366 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to LCA, JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback