HI SB1365 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1365
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning on January 1, 2022, requires each managed care organization to annually report its medical loss ratio to the department of human services.
Title
Relating To Medical Loss Ratios.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to HTH/HMS, CPN. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1384 (Same As) 2022-02-08 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB1365 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to HTH/HMS, CPN.
SB1365 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to HTH/HMS, CPN.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1365&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB1365_.HTM |