HI SB1358 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB1358

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires an applicant for a permit for a protest or activity to submit an attestation that all law, including traffic laws, will be obeyed. Any permit application requires approval from the department, the county, and the police. Amends the offense of disorderly conduct to include a fine of $100 for obstruction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Permits.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-01SenateReferred to JDC.
2021-01-29SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB1358 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback