HI SB1357 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - Act 090, 06/21/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1191).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the sunset dates for the issuance of county affordable housing credits to the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands pursuant to Act 141, Session Laws of Hawaii 2009, as amended, and Act 98, Session Laws of Hawaii 2012, as amended, to 7/1/2030. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Affordable Housing On Hawaiian Home Lands.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-21SenateAct 090, 06/21/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1191).
2023-06-21HouseAct 090, on 06/21/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1191).
2023-05-04SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2023-05-04SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 900).
2023-05-02HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993).
2023-05-02HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1).
2023-05-02SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2023-04-28HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-23.
2023-04-28HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 92) as amended in (CD 1).
2023-04-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23.
2023-04-28SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 92).
2023-04-27HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Yamashita, Aiu, Kila, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2023-04-27SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Rhoads, DeCoite, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2023-04-26SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-23 2:05PM; Conference Room 325.
2023-04-25SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-23 2:05PM; Conference Room 325.
2023-04-24SenateSenate Conferees Added: Senator Fevella added as Conferee.
2023-04-24HouseReceived notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 973).
2023-04-24SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 840).
2023-04-21HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Hashimoto, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Aiu, Kila, Matsumoto.
2023-04-20HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 915).
2023-04-20SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Shimabukuro Chair; Rhoads, DeCoite Co-Chairs.
2023-04-13HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 888).
2023-04-13SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2023-04-13SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 783).
2023-04-11HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2023-04-06HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2133), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2023-04-04HouseThe committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Ward.
2023-03-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-04-23 3:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-03-21HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1).
2023-03-21HouseReported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1397) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2023-03-17HouseThe committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Aiu, Evslin, Kitagawa, Marten, Onishi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kila.
2023-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Friday, 03-17-23 9:30AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-03-09HouseReferred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 17
2023-03-09HousePass First Reading
2023-03-07HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 422) in amended form (SD 1).
2023-03-07SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
2023-03-03SenateOne Day Notice 03-07-23.
2023-03-03SenateReported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1107) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2023-03-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2023-03-03SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
2023-02-28SenateThe committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-03-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
2023-02-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
2023-02-14SenateReported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 223) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
2023-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Fevella, Ihara, Keohokalole, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2023-02-03SenateThe committee(s) on HWN added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-07-23 1:01PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
2023-02-01SenateRe-Referred to HWN, JDC/WAM.
2023-01-31SenateRe-Referred to HWN, JDC.
2023-01-30SenateReferred to PSM/HWN, JDC.
2023-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-01-25SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1059 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 3

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback